John Rishton, the former chief executive of Dutch retailer Ahold, is set to take a seat on Unilever's boards of directors, the consumer goods giant said today (17 December). Rishton, who was Ahold boss between 2007 and 2011, will be put ...
Tags: John Rishton, Dutch retailer Ahold, Food
The Directors of Chinalco Yunnan Copper Resources Limited have pleasure outlining the path forward for the Company. CYU continues to maintain the full support of its major shareholder, Chinalco, which holds 43% of the issued shares ...
Tags: Chinalco Yunnan Copper Resources, mining, mining company, copper
Southern Hemisphere Mining has added the experienced Mr Paul McRae to the board as a non executive director. Mr McRae is serving as nominee director for Lundin Mining Corporation where he currently holds the position of senior VP, ...
Tags: Southern Hemisphere Mining, mining industrial projects
Andrew Price has been appointed as a non-executive director of troubled paper company Paperlinx. Price earlier this year tried to unseat Harry Boon as chairman of Paperlinx, which has been the subject of a far-reaching strategic review ...
Tags: Paperlinx, Andrew Price, paper company
RSA Group,a UK based commercial insurer,has appointed Martin Scicluna as its new chairman,effective from 01 January 2013. Scicluna,who holds considerable financial services experience,will succeed RSA's out going chairman,John Napier,who ...
Tags: RSA Group, New Chairman, commercial insurer
Billabong International Limited is pleased to announce the appointment of Mr.Howard Mowlem to the Board of Directors. Howard Mowlem will be appointed as a Non-Executive Director of Billabong International Limited at a board meeting to ...
Mothercare plc is pleased to announce the appointment of Richard Rivers as its senior independent director with effect from 23 November 2012,replacing Bernard Cragg who is retiring as a non-executive director at the end of the year. Alan ...
Tags: Mothercare plc, Richard Rivers, senior independent director
Specialty Fashion Group Limited announced its intention to appoint Megan Quinn as a non-executive director, effective 30 October 2012. Megan Quinn was a co-founder of Net-A-Porter, an online fashion retailer. She has more than 20 years ...
Tags: Specialty Fashion Group, appoint, fashion retailer, women's fashion
David Jones Limited (DJS) announced the appointment of Jane Harvey as a Non-executive Director of the Company. It is intended that Ms Harvey will stand for election as a director at the Company’s Annual General Meeting on 23 November ...
Debenhams plc announces that it has appointed Peter Fitzgerald as a non-executive director. Nigel Northridge,Chairman of Debenhams,said: "Peter Fitzgerald has a wealth of experience in helping retail businesses to realise their online ...
Tags: Debenhams, Peter Fitzgerald, retail, online
The board of Paperlinx has been overhauled with the resignation of a fourth director and the appointment of a new chairman and a non-executive director. Michael Barker has been appointed chairman with immediate effect, thus ensuring an ...
Paperlinx chairman Harry Boon and two other non-executive directors of the troubled paper company have announced their resignation, effective 28 September. Boon, Lyndsey Cattermole and Anthony Clarke have stepped down following a ...
Tags: Paperlinx, resignation, non-executive directors, chairman
Epiwafer foundry and substrate maker IQE plc of Cardiff,Wales,UK has appointed David Grant CBE,FREng,FLSW,CEng,FIET as a non-executive director and as senior independent director of the Group. Grant,age 65,gained his PhD in Engineering ...
The board of directors of Kumba is pleased to announce the appointment of Mr Fani Titi as non-executive chairman of Kumba with effect from 1 October 2012.Mr Titi will take over the chairmanship of Kumba from Mr Allen Morgan who has served ...
Tags: Chairman, Bank, Kumba board, Investec